NM HB266 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] h and then to cncrd Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] h and then to cncrd Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Short-term Rental Occupancy Tax
Title
Short-term Rental Occupancy Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Roberto Gonzales [D] | Rep. Matthew McQueen [D] | Rep. Debbie Rodella [D] | Rep. Carl Trujillo [D] |
Rep. Jim Trujillo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] h and then to cncrd Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Passed Senate (30-8) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Passed House (61-0) |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Taxation & Revenue |