NM HB264 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - [LD 32] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - [LD 32] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School district building systems needs
Title
School district building systems needs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (66-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-19 | House | [LD 26] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | House | [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Education |
2013-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Education and then to House Judiciary |