NM HB260 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - [LD 28] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - [LD 28] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation Of Biosimilar Products
Title
Regulation Of Biosimilar Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | [LD 28] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 48 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Passed Senate (35-0) |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-10 | Senate | [LD 25] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-02-10 | Senate | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (57-2) |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] HHouse Health |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] HHouse Health and then to House Business & Industry |