NM HB249 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - [LD 28] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - [LD 28] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
College Special Event Gross Receipts
Title
College Special Event Gross Receipts
Sponsors
Rep. Joanne Ferrary [D] | Rep. Doreen Gallegos [D] | Rep. Bealquin Gomez [D] | Rep. Rodolpho Martinez [D] |
Rep. Angelica Rubio [D] | Rep. Nathan Small [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | [LD 28] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 46 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Passed Senate (30-6) |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (68-0) |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Education |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to House Education and then to House Taxation & Revenue |