NM HB248 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Native american veterans' tax settlements
Title
Native american veterans' tax settlements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (62-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-29 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2014-01-29 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Taxation & Revenue and then to House Appropriations & Finance |