NM HB245 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
"construction Material" In Gross Receipts Act
Title
"construction Material" In Gross Receipts Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 58 |
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 10] h and then to cncrd |
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (35-0) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-02-07 | Senate | [LD 12] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2018-02-02 | House | [LD 5] Passed House (65-0) |
2018-02-02 | House | [LD 5] fl and then to sub adptd |
2018-02-02 | House | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Printed |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Not Printed |