NM HB24 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] h/cncrd SGND (Mar.8) Ch.41.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] h/cncrd SGND (Mar.8) Ch.41.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Educational opportunity for military children
Title
Educational opportunity for military children
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Cote [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] h/cncrd SGND (Mar.8) Ch.41. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] fl/a- PASSED/S (33-0) | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] SEC/SJC-SEC- DP-SJC | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/H (69-0) | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] DP/a | |
2010-01-28 | [LD 8] DP-HJC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] w/drn - ref HEC/HJC-HEC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] not prntd-HRC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HPREF |