NM HB229 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (33-5) SGND (Mar.9) Ch.99.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (33-5) SGND (Mar.9) Ch.99.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish metro court in certain counties
Title
Establish metro court in certain counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/S (33-5) SGND (Mar.9) Ch.99. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] DP | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] SJC | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DP - PASSED/H (61-7) | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP/a-HAFC | |
2010-01-27 | [LD 7] HJC/HAFC-HJC |