NM HB228 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-16 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-16 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Health Care Tax Credit Eligibility
Title
Rural Health Care Tax Credit Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-16 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-16 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2020-02-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0 |
2020-02-14 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-03 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-24 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HTRC |