NM HB224 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2016 - 50% progression
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

State Defense Force Maximum Age

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Defense Force Maximum Age

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-02Senate[LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
2016-02-02Senate[LD 15] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2016-02-02Senate[LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted
2016-01-30Senate[LD 12] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2016-01-30Senate[LD 12] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary
2016-01-26House[LD 8] Passed House (58-0)
2016-01-25House[LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted
2016-01-24House[LD 6] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs
2016-01-24House[LD 6] Referred to House Judiciary Assigned toerral withdrawn
2016-01-21House[LD 3] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs
2016-01-21House[LD 3] Assigned to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs and then to House Judiciary
2016-01-21House[LD 3] Assigned to
2016-01-21House[LD 3] Printed
2016-01-21House[LD 3] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2016-01-20House[LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business
2016-01-20House[LD 2] Not Printed

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback