NM HB221 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - SEC: Reported by committee without a recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - SEC: Reported by committee without a recommendation
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
K-2nd Grade Assessment Changes
Title
K-2nd Grade Assessment Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee without a recommendation |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:42 N:21 |
2021-03-01 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-18 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-02 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HSEIC |