NM HB221 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reserve law enforcement officers
Title
Reserve law enforcement officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-10 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (64-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-21 | House | [LD 28] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-21 | House | [LD 28] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2013-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2013-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Judiciary |