NM HB220 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Vehicle Tax Distributions
Title
Motor Vehicle Tax Distributions
Sponsors
Rep. Randal Crowder [R] | Sen. Roberto Gonzales [D] | Rep. Jason Harper [R] | Rep. Javier Martinez [D] |
Rep. Patricio Ruiloba [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-17 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2020-02-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:58 N:0 |
2020-02-11 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2020-02-05 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-24 | House | Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HTRC |