NM HB220 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] PASSED/S (34-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.171.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] PASSED/S (34-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.171.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Time period for right of redemption
Title
Time period for right of redemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] PASSED/S (34-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.171. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SJC | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] SCORC/SJC-SCORC | |
2011-02-19 | [LD 33] PASSED/H (68-0) | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] DP/a | |
2011-02-06 | [LD 20] DP/a-HJC | |
2011-01-23 | [LD 6] HBIC/HJC-HBIC |