NM HB205 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (37-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.58.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (37-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.58.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Mortgage foreclosure consultant fraud
Title
Mortgage foreclosure consultant fraud
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/S (37-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.58. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] DP | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] SJC | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DNP-CS/DP - PASSED/H (68-0) | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] DP-HJC | |
2010-01-26 | [LD 6] HBIC/HJC-HBIC |