NM HB200 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 64 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 64 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Trust Board Projects & Nm Unit Fund
Title
Water Trust Board Projects & Nm Unit Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 64 - Apr. 5 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:26 N:15 |
2021-03-13 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-09 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SJC |
2021-02-25 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:43 N:24 |
2021-02-23 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-16 | House | HAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-28 | House | Sent to HAWC - Referrals: HAWC/HJC |