NM HB200 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-10 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-10 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
High-wage Jobs Tax Credit Eligibility
Title
High-wage Jobs Tax Credit Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-02-07 | Senate | [LD 12] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2018-02-02 | House | [LD 5] Passed House (64-0) |
2018-02-02 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-30 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-01-30 | House | [LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] HLEDC |
2018-01-24 | House | [LD 2] HLEDC and then to House Taxation & Revenue |