NM HB2 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 137 - Apr. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

General Appropriation Act Of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Appropriation Act Of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-19HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 137 - Apr. 9
2021-03-19HouseHouse has concurred with Senate Amendments
2021-03-17SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:29 N:13
2021-03-16SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2021-02-24SenateSent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
2021-02-24HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:60 N:10
2021-02-22HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2021-01-19HouseSent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback