NM HB199 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Arts & cultural district designation
Title
Arts & cultural district designation
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Jeff [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (66-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | House | [LD 21] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-02-12 | House | [LD 21] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Assigned to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs and then to House Appropriations & Finance |