NM HB198 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] h/cncrd SGND (Mar.3) Ch.28.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] h/cncrd SGND (Mar.3) Ch.28.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Voting system maintenance & storage
Title
Voting system maintenance & storage
Sponsors
Rep. Rhonda King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | [LD 24] h/cncrd SGND (Mar.3) Ch.28. | |
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] fl/a- PASSED/S (34-0) | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] SFC | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] PASSED/H (67-0) | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DNP-CS/DP | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] DP/a-HAFC | |
2010-01-27 | [LD 7] w/drn - prntd- ref HVEC/HAFC-HVEC | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] not prntd-HRC |