NM HB191 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to: HRC
Pending: House Rules & Order of Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to: HRC
Pending: House Rules & Order of Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Corrections Ombudsman Act
Title
Corrections Ombudsman Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to: HRC |
2021-03-11 | House | w/drn h/calendar |
2021-03-08 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-11 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-28 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC/HAFC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=191&year=21 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/21%20Regular/bills/house/HB0191.pdf |