NM HB187 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (31-2) SGND (Apr. 7) Ch.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (31-2) SGND (Apr. 7) Ch.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expanded-function dental auxiliaries
Title
Expanded-function dental auxiliaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (31-2) SGND (Apr. 7) Ch.113. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] SPAC | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] PASSED/H (68-1) | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP | |
2011-02-03 | [LD 17] DP-HBIC | |
2011-01-21 | [LD 4] HHGAC/HBIC-HHGAC |