NM HB185 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (41-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 38.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (41-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 38.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial real estate broker lien act
Title
Commercial real estate broker lien act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (41-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 38. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (66-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Printed |
2014-02-03 | House | [LD 10] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Not Printed |