NM HB182 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 57 - Mar. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 57 - Mar. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Election Changes
Title
Election Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 57 - Mar. 5 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:25 N:14 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:38 N:28 |
2024-02-08 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2024-01-31 | House | HGEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-22 | House | Sent to HGEIC - Referrals: HGEIC/HJC |