NM HB182 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reading Initiative Literacy & Biliteracy
Title
Reading Initiative Literacy & Biliteracy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Sent to SPAC - Referrals: SPAC/SEC |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0 |
2019-02-18 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-01 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HEC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |