NM HB180 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - [LD 15] SCORC/SJC-SCORC API.
Pending: Senate Corporations & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - [LD 15] SCORC/SJC-SCORC API.
Pending: Senate Corporations & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Worker adjustment & retraining notification
Title
Worker adjustment & retraining notification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] SCORC/SJC-SCORC API. | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DNP-CS/DP - PASSED/H (41-27) | |
2010-01-27 | [LD 7] DP/a-HJC | |
2010-01-22 | [LD 4] HLC/HJC-HLC |