NM HB177 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Energy efficient home purchase tax credit
Title
Energy efficient home purchase tax credit
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Egolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-10 | [LD 19] Passed House (44-20) | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Do not pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Taxation & Revenue |