NM HB171 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (37-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 59.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (37-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 59.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Birthing workforce retention fund awards
Title
Birthing workforce retention fund awards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | [LD 51] Passed Senate (37-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 59. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-25 | Senate | [LD 27] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] Passed House (64-0) |
2015-02-24 | House | [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-04 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HHC |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HHC and then to House Judiciary |