NM HB164 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 57.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 57.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School transportation info reporting
Title
School transportation info reporting
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Roch [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | [LD 51] Passed Senate (40-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 57. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Education |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2015-02-06 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (66-0) |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-01-29 | House | [LD 8] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2015-01-29 | House | [LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Education |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to House Education and then to House Transportation & Public Works |