NM HB163 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 47 - Mar. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 47 - Mar. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Changes
Title
Tax Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Micaela Cadena [D] | Rep. Christine Chandler [D] | Rep. Pamelya Herndon [D] | Rep. Javier Martinez [D] |
Sen. Michael Padilla [D] | Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 47 - Mar. 8 |
2022-02-17 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2022-02-17 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:59 N:9 |
2022-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2022-02-14 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2022-01-28 | House | Sent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC |