NM HB161 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] w/drn h/calendar- ref HJC-HJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] w/drn h/calendar- ref HJC-HJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Land office contractor contributions
Title
Land office contractor contributions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] w/drn h/calendar- ref HJC-HJC API. | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] DP | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DP-HVEC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] HHGAC/HVEC-HHGAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=161&year=10 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/10%20Regular/bills/house/HB0161.pdf |