NM HB16 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] PASSED/S (36-3) SGND (Mar.2) Ch.19.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] PASSED/S (36-3) SGND (Mar.2) Ch.19.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement beneficiary deselection option
Title
Retirement beneficiary deselection option
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] PASSED/S (36-3) SGND (Mar.2) Ch.19. | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP-SFC | |
2010-01-29 | [LD 9] SPAC/SFC-SPAC | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] PASSED/H (66-0) | |
2010-02-04 | [LD 13] DP/a | |
2010-02-02 | [LD 11] DP-HAFC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] ref HCPAC/HAFC-HCPAC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] not prntd-HRC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HPREF |