NM HB156 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 6) Ch. 23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 6) Ch. 23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fuel prices & school transportation emergency
Title
Fuel prices & school transportation emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-15 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (39-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 6) Ch. 23. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Education |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (62-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Education |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Education |