NM HB143 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (31-0) SGND (Apr.1) Ch. 24.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (31-0) SGND (Apr.1) Ch. 24.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nmfa water project fund projects
Title
Nmfa water project fund projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (31-0) SGND (Apr.1) Ch. 24. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] w/drn | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SFC | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] SCONC/SFC-SCONC | |
2011-02-10 | [LD 24] fl/a- PASSED/H (60-8) | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] w/drn h/calendar- re-ref HTRC- HTRC- DP/a | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] DP/a | |
2011-01-30 | [LD 13] DP/a-HTRC | |
2011-01-20 | [LD 3] HAGC/HTRC-HAGC |