NM HB141 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-14 - SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-14 - SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ed Infrastructure Technology Definition
Title
Ed Infrastructure Technology Definition
Sponsors
Rep. Christine Chandler [D] | Rep. Natalie Figueroa [D] | Rep. Joy Garratt [D] | Rep. Susan Herrera [D] |
Rep. Marian Matthews [D] | Rep. Debra Sarinana [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-14 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-05 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC |
2021-02-26 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:1 |
2021-02-19 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-04 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-25 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HTPWC |