NM HB141 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - [LD 28] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - [LD 28] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public recreation land special valuation
Title
Public recreation land special valuation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | House | [LD 28] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted and then to a |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] HWMC |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Assigned to HGEIC and then to HWMC and then to House Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] HGEIC |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] HGEIC and then to House Judiciary and then to HWMC |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] Assigned to HWMC |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HGEIC |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HGEIC and then to House Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=141&year=15 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/15%20Regular/bills/house/HB0141.pdf |