NM HB133 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - [LD 30] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Expand scope of certain sexual crimes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expand scope of certain sexual crimes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02Senate[LD 30] Action postponed indefinitely
2015-03-02Senate[LD 30] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2015-03-02Senate[LD 30] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary
2015-02-27House[LD 29] Passed House (65-0)
2015-02-25House[LD 27] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2015-02-25House[LD 27] Do not pass committee report adopted
2015-01-22House[LD 3] Referred to House Judiciary
2015-01-20House[LD 1] House Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback