NM HB124 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - [LD 16] SRC/SJC-SRC API.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - [LD 16] SRC/SJC-SRC API.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
State contractor registration & requirements
Title
State contractor registration & requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Egolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] SRC/SJC-SRC API. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DNP-CS/DP - fl/a- PASSED/H (67-0) | |
2010-01-26 | [LD 6] DP-HJC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] HHGAC/HJC-HHGAC |