NM HB123 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - [LD 21] Passed Senate (36-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.5) Ch.38.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - [LD 21] Passed Senate (36-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.5) Ch.38.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extend angel investment tax credit
Title
Extend angel investment tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | [LD 21] Passed Senate (36-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.5) Ch.38. | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance | |
2012-02-10 | [LD 19] Passed House (67-0) | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-01 | [LD 12] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue | |
2012-02-01 | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Business & Industry | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Taxation & Revenue |