NM HB120 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (33-8) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.2) Ch.123.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (33-8) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.2) Ch.123.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Locomotive fuel gross receipts
Title
Locomotive fuel gross receipts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (33-8) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.2) Ch.123. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2013-02-25 | House | [LD 30] Passed House (64-1) |
2013-02-21 | House | [LD 28] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2013-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Taxation & Revenue and then to House Appropriations & Finance |