NM HB12 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (20-16) SGND (Mar.9) Ch.94.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (20-16) SGND (Mar.9) Ch.94.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurer service reimbursement
Title
Health insurer service reimbursement
Sponsors
Rep. John Heaton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/S (20-16) SGND (Mar.9) Ch.94. | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] SPAC/SCORC-SPAC- DP-SCORC | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/H (46-21) | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] DNP-CS/DP | |
2010-01-22 | [LD 4] DP-HBIC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HHGAC/HBIC-HHGAC |