NM HB117 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 18] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 18] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Librarian & Historic Preservation Funds
Title
Librarian & Historic Preservation Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | [LD 18] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 23 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (28-0) |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-02-08 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-07 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2018-02-07 | Senate | [LD 12] Assigned to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2018-02-02 | House | [LD 5] Passed House (67-0) |
2018-02-02 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] HSIVC |
2018-01-26 | House | [LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] HLELC |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to HLELC and then to HSIVC |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |