NM HB117 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - [LD 38] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - [LD 38] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Statute of limitations for certain crimes
Title
Statute of limitations for certain crimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | [LD 38] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-07 | Senate | [LD 38] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | Senate | [LD 38] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-31 | Senate | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-31 | Senate | [LD 13] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-06 | House | [LD 17] Passed House (64-0) |
2013-02-04 | House | [LD 15] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=117&year=13 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/13%20Regular/bills/house/HB0117.pdf |