NM HB113 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - [LD 17] PASSED/S (40-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.89.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - [LD 17] PASSED/S (40-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.89.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Aquatic invasive species control
Title
Aquatic invasive species control
Sponsors
Rep. Don Tripp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] PASSED/S (40-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.89. | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP-SJC- DP | |
2010-01-28 | [LD 8] SCONC/SJC-SCONC | |
2010-02-04 | [LD 13] PASSED/H (55-0) | |
2010-02-02 | [LD 11] DP | |
2010-01-26 | [LD 6] DP-HENRC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] HAGC/HENRC-HAGC |