NM HB108 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rules development requirements
Title
Rules development requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Referred to Senate Rules |
2013-02-14 | Senate | [LD 23] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-01 | House | [LD 34] Passed House (70-0) |
2013-02-27 | House | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-04 | House | [LD 15] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | House | [LD 15] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs and then to House Judiciary |