NM HB106 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - [LD 31] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - [LD 31] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Baby Changing Facilities In Men's Rooms
Title
Baby Changing Facilities In Men's Rooms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (44-22) |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] HHouse Health |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to HHouse Health |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |