NM HB103 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Campaign Reporting Act Changes
Title
Campaign Reporting Act Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SJC |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:48 N:21 |
2023-02-07 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-01-30 | House | HGEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-01-19 | House | Sent to HGEIC - Referrals: HGEIC/HJC |