NM HB103 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 18] Passed Senate (35-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 18] Passed Senate (35-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gold Star Family License Plate Eligibility
Title
Gold Star Family License Plate Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (35-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2018-02-05 | House | [LD 5] Passed House (67-0) |
2018-02-01 | House | [LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-30 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-01-30 | House | [LD 3] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-23 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2018-01-23 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-01-23 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2018-01-23 | House | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-23 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2018-01-16 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |