NJ SR62 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Department of Defense to reinstate the POW/MIA designation.
Title
Urges Department of Defense to reinstate the POW/MIA designation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-01 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-09-30 | Passed by the Senate (Voice) | |
2010-08-23 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR52 (Same As) 2010-03-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/SR62 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/SR/62_I1.HTM |