NJ SJR87 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates April as "Genocide Awareness Month."
Title
Designates April as "Genocide Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-05 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR120 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/SJR87 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/SJR/87_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR87 |